THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:31:43 AM
Shaikh, Wajid Abdullah
CPSO#:
29035
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Apr 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services
Tel: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 11 Nov 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:05 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Aug 2019 |