skip to content

Shaikh, Muhammed Akhtar

CPSO#: 97054

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Shaikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shaikh ( CPSO# 97054 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:23 Nov 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2015 Active
 Dr.  Muhammed  Akhtar  Shaikh  may  practise medicine independently in internal
            medicine.