THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 7:30:28 AM
Shaikh, Muhammed Akhtar
CPSO#:
97054
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Nov 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Karachi, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Nov 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Nov 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jun 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jun 2015 |
|
Active |