skip to content

Shahein, Abdul Rahman Hussein Ismail Hassan

CPSO#: 90025

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 16 Nov 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
PEAP - R - Paediatric Haematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Dec 2008 to 15 Feb 2009
EL - Paediatric Haematology

University Of Toronto, 16 Feb 2009 to 22 Mar 2009
EL - Paediatric Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 23 Mar 2009 to 29 Apr 2009
EL - Paediatric Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012