THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:43:10 PM
Shahein, Abdul Rahman Hussein Ismail Hassan
CPSO#:
90025
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
PEAP - R - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2008 to 15 Feb 2009
EL - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2009 to 22 Mar 2009
EL - Paediatric Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 23 Mar 2009 to 29 Apr 2009
EL - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Apr 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |