skip to content

Seitelbach, Maayan

CPSO#: 88944

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 May 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oncology Clinic - Tower 1
Scarborough Health Network
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-431-8113
Fax: 416-431-8279 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Centen
Oncology Clinic
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-281-7483
Fax: 416-281-7228
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Seitelbach and Gurfinkel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gurfinkel ( CPSO# 88805 )
Dr. M. Seitelbach ( CPSO# 88944 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
880 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1K 1H8
Phone Number: (416) 246-4848

Business Address:
204-4500 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 2N9
Phone Number: (416) 287-3100

Business Address:
3830 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1G 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 439-1243

Business Address:
301-294 Main Street
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Phone Number: (416) 693-3030

Business Address:
Markham-Kingston Medical Centre
Suite 18
3545 Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M1M 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 266-6600

Business Address:
Oncology Clinic - Tower 1
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8113

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:24 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAAYAN SEITELBACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEITELBACH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 May 2011 to 24 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2015