THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 12:17:24 PM
Seitelbach, Maayan
CPSO#:
88944
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 May 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oncology Clinic - Tower 1
Scarborough Health Network
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-431-8113
Fax: 416-431-8279
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAAYAN SEITELBACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEITELBACH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 May 2011 to 24 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2015 |