skip to content

Segedi, Maja

CPSO#: 87823

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian, Slovak

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 18 Oct 2007 to 30 Oct 2007
EL - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Sep 2014
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015