THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 0:52:43 AM
Segedi, Maja
CPSO#:
87823
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Serbian, Slovak
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 18 Oct 2007 to 30 Oct 2007
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Sep 2014
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Oct 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |