skip to content

Seed, Michael Thomas Mark

CPSO#: 85250

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Cardiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500 Ext. 206280
Fax: (416) 813-7547 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nina Stein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Seed ( CPSO# 85250 )
Dr. N. Stein ( CPSO# 91493 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:23 Aug 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Cardiology Effective:23 Aug 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:23 Aug 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Aug 2019 Active
 1.    Dr. Michael Thomas Mark Seed may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Pediatrics, Division of Cardiology and Division of Radiology,
                        University of Toronto, in which Dr. Seed holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Seed no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.