THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:29:54 PM
Seed, Michael Thomas Mark
CPSO#:
85250
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Cardiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500 Ext. 206280
Fax: (416) 813-7547
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:23 Aug 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:23 Aug 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:23 Aug 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Aug 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Aug 2019 |
|
Active |