skip to content

Seaton, Carl Alton

CPSO#: 96958

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Angeline Street
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: (705) 328-6183 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H5S5
Canada
Phone: 613-938-4240
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Carl Seaton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: Dr. Carl Seaton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Seaton ( CPSO# 96958 )

Business Address:
10 Angeline St N
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: 7053946111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CARL ALTON SEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEATON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Jan 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2013