THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 20:46:37 PM
Seaton, Carl Alton
CPSO#:
96958
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Angeline St N
Lindsay ON K9V 4M8
Phone: 7053246111 Ext. 4511
Fax: 7053286060
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CARL ALTON SEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEATON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Jan 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2013 |