skip to content

Scott, Francis Gordon Ellis

CPSO#: 19507

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jun 1965

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Box 1540 St. Marys Ontario N4X 1B9
Instructions: Former patients should send medical records requests to Dr. Scott at the above noted address
Date Received: 13 Feb 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:13 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2015