THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:32:38 AM
Scott, Francis Gordon Ellis
CPSO#:
19507
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jun 1965
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Former patients should send medical records requests to Dr. Scott at the above noted address
Box 1540
St. Marys Ontario N4X 1B9
Date Received: 13 Feb 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:13 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1965 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Aug 2015 |