skip to content

Schweitzer, Mark Eliot

CPSO#: 89842

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State Univ of New York at Buffalo, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:23 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2013