THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:00:24 AM
Schweitzer, Mark Eliot
CPSO#:
89842
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: State Univ of New York at Buffalo, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:23 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Sep 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2013 |