skip to content

Saxena, Pradeep

CPSO#: 87563

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Kanpur University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8 - 6521 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7W1
Phone: (905) 876-0002
Fax: (905) 876-0003 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

20 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
Unit 5
Mississauga ON  L5R 3K7
Canada
Phone: 905 501 0006
Fax: 905 501 0090
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Saxena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Saxena ( CPSO# 87563 )
Dr. M. Singh ( CPSO# 107625)

Business Address:
6521 Derry Road
Suite 8
Milton ON  L9T 7W1
Phone Number: (905) 876-0002

Business Address:
Suite 5
20 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
Mississauga ON  L5R 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 501-0006


Corporation Name: Mala Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Saxena ( CPSO# 87563 )
Dr. M. Singh ( CPSO# 107625)

Business Address:
Suite 5
20 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
Mississauga ON  L5R 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 501-0006

Business Address:
6521 Derry Road
Suite 8
Milton ON  L9T 7W1
Phone Number: (905) 876-0002


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India
Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PRADEEP SAXENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAXENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 24 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2009