THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:03:11 AM
Saxena, Pradeep
CPSO#:
87563
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Kanpur University, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
8 - 6521 Derry Road
Milton ON L9T 7W1
Phone: (905) 876-0002
Fax: (905) 876-0003
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Saskatchewan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Aug 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PRADEEP SAXENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAXENA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 24 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 25 Nov 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2009 |