skip to content

Sawicki, Jakub Tomasz

CPSO#: 95159

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
27 Roncesvalles Avenue, Suite 303
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: 416-588-5141
Fax: 416-588-8105 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

906 Brant Street, Suite 202
Burlington ON  L7R 2J5
Canada
Phone: 905-631-8700
Fax: 905-631-8709
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sawicki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sawicki ( CPSO# 95159 )
Dr. C. Sawicki ( CPSO# 104141)

Business Address:
601 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 281-9898

Business Address:
303 - 27 Roncesvalles Ave.
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 588-5141

Business Address:
202 - 906 Brant St.
Burlington ON  L7R 2J5
Phone Number: (905) 631-8700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAKUB TOMASZ SAWICKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWICKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013