THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 9:31:15 AM
Sawicki, Jakub Tomasz
CPSO#:
95159
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
19 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
19-Jul-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Queen's University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
222 Glen Rd
Toronto ON M4W 2X3
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Sawicki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 2 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 19 Jul 2022 |