skip to content

Samiee Zafarghandy, Samira

CPSO#: 87078

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Oct 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Neonatology
1280 Main street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76342 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Samiee Zafarghandy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Samiee Zafarghandy ( CPSO# 87078 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Neonatology
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Iran

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMIRA SAMIEE ZAFARGHANDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMIEE ZAFARGHANDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Pediatrics

Western University, 23 Sep 2007 to 12 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 13 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 15 Aug 2009 to 08 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2010 to 30 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
EL - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012