THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 5:00:57 AM
Samiee Zafarghandy, Samira
CPSO#:
87078
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Oct 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Neonatology
1280 Main street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4L8
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76342
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Aug 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMIRA SAMIEE ZAFARGHANDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMIEE ZAFARGHANDY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2007 to 12 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Aug 2009 to 08 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2010 to 30 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 13 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
EL - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2012 |