skip to content

Salsberg, Jennifer Michelle

CPSO#: 86258

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Kwinter, Jennifer Michelle (used until: 26 Oct 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Division of Dermatology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-7546
Fax: 416-323-6236 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medcan Clinic
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5981
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

199 Avenue Road
Front Door
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Canada
Phone: 416-925-5775
Fax: 416-925-6717
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jennifer Salsberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Salsberg ( CPSO# 86258 )

Business Address:
199 Avenue Road
Front Door
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Phone Number: (416) 925-5775

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Dermatology Department
60 Grosvenor Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B6
Phone Number: (416) 515-8808

Business Address:
Medcan Clinic
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5990

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MICHELLE SALSBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALSBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2012