THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 12:44:30 PM
Salsberg, Jennifer Michelle
CPSO#:
86258
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Kwinter, Jennifer Michelle (used until: 26 Oct 2010 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Division of Dermatology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-7546
Fax: 416-323-6236
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER MICHELLE SALSBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALSBERG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2012 |