skip to content

Salmon, Ernest Arnold Trevorlyn

CPSO#: 20790

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jan 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3508 7th Line
Port Hope ON  L1A 3V5
Phone: 1-905-509-5867
Fax: 1-905-797-2996 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Digestive Health Clinic
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-1700
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

74 Fifeshire Rd
North York ON  M2L 2G8
Canada
Phone: 1-905-509-5867
Fax: 1-905-797-2996
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ernest Salmon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Salmon ( CPSO# 20790 )

Business Address:
301 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 509-5862

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERNEST ARNOLD TREVORLYN SALMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALMON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Jan 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1974