THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 12:22:32 PM
Salmon, Ernest Arnold Trevorlyn
CPSO#:
20790
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jan 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jan 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3508 7th Line
Port Hope ON L1A 3V5
Phone: 1-905-509-5867
Fax: 1-905-797-2996
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERNEST ARNOLD TREVORLYN SALMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALMON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1967 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 02 Jan 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 1974 |