Saleh, Asem (CPSO#: 101175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401-1017 Wilson Ave
North York ON  M3K 1Z1
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asem Saleh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Saleh ( CPSO# 101175)

Business Address:
401- 1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone Number: (416) 742-2961

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASEM SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018