THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 2:50:12 AM
Saleh, Asem
CPSO#:
101175
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: McMaster University, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
605-1275 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3J 0L5
Phone: 416-742-2961
Fax: 416-742-0076
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASEM SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Vascular Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |