skip to content

Karim, Sadiqa

CPSO#: 94550

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 28 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Oct 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education: Sind Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sadiqa Karim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Oct 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 27 Jul 2023
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 28 Jul 2023

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 27 Jul 2023
Summary:

On July 27, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Karim engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and conduct unbecoming a physician in relation to her:
  • unlawful obtaining of Ontario Health Insurance Plan (OHIP) coverage as a United States resident;
  • OHIP billings in respect of services provided to her family member who was also not entitled to OHIP benefits;
  • treatment of her family member in contravention of College policy;
  • failure to provide complete and accurate information to the College in respect of her continued licensure in the United States.
The Tribunal ordered that: 
 
1. Dr. Karim attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Karim’s certificate of registration for five months commencing July 28, 2023;
3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Karim’s certificate of registration;
4. Dr. Karim pay a fine to the Minister of Finance in the amount of $16,636 within three months of the order, and provide proof of payment to the Registrar;
5. Dr. Karim pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 within 30 days of the date of the order. 
 
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected]
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2023-07-27