THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:16:10 AM
Karim, Sadiqa
CPSO#:
94550
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Dec 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
21 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Sind Medical College, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
4383 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON L2E 6A6
Phone: (905) 354-1111
Fax: (905) 354-7902
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Sadiqa Karim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Oct 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Oct 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 24 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Dec 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 19 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 27 Jul 2023 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 28 Jul 2023 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 28 Dec 2023 |
Terms and conditions amended by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 25 Jan 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 25 Jan 2024 |
|
Active |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 27 Jul 2023
Summary:
On July 27, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Karim engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and conduct unbecoming a physician in relation to her:- unlawful obtaining of Ontario Health Insurance Plan (OHIP) coverage as a United States resident;
- OHIP billings in respect of services provided to her family member who was also not entitled to OHIP benefits;
- treatment of her family member in contravention of College policy;
- failure to provide complete and accurate information to the College in respect of her continued licensure in the United States.
The Tribunal ordered that:
1. Dr. Karim attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Karim’s certificate of registration for five months commencing July 28, 2023;
3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Karim’s certificate of registration;
4. Dr. Karim pay a fine to the Minister of Finance in the amount of $16,636 within three months of the order, and provide proof of payment to the Registrar;
5. Dr. Karim pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 within 30 days of the date of the order.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2023-07-27