skip to content

Yi, Soojin Leslie

CPSO#: 100204

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 May 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3111
Fax: (416) 340-4896 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Soojin L. Yi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yi ( CPSO# 100204)

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3946

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Emergency Department
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5757

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 25 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SOOJIN LESLIE YI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2013
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.