skip to content

Qureshi, Shahzad

CPSO#: 89731

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Mar 2023

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: 9058532222 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G1N2
Canada
Phone: 9055050950
Fax: 9058419404
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

535 Mulock Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5H2
Canada
Phone: 2893664564
Fax: 2893662065
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

21-117 Young St
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9
Canada
Phone: 7054340074
Fax: 7054349074
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

4779 Steeles Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1V 4S7
Canada
Phone: 4162984956
Fax: 4167549543
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

300 Rossland Rd E
Oshawa ON  L1Z 0M1
Canada
Phone: 9052311829
Fax: 9052311849
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

3838 Midland Ave
Scarborough ON  M1V 5K5
Canada
Phone: 9052311829
Fax: 9052311849
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shahzad Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Qureshi ( CPSO# 89731 )

Business Address:
300-535 Mulock Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5H2
Phone Number: (905) 953-9044

Business Address:
300-535 Mulock Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5H2
Phone Number: (905) 953-9044

Business Address:
14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Phone Number: (905) 505-0950

Business Address:
14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Phone Number: (905) 505-0950

Business Address:
21-117 Yonge Street
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9
Phone Number: (705) 434-0074

Business Address:
21-117 Yonge Street
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9
Phone Number: (705) 434-0074

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:02 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2023
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 03 Mar 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 03 Mar 2023 Active
 As from March 3, 2023, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Shahzad Qureshi in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Qureshi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")
of
DR. SHAHZAD QURESHI
("Dr. Qureshi")
to 
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
________________________________________

A.	PREAMBLE
(1)	In this Undertaking:
"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.
(2)	I, Dr. Qureshi, certificate of registration number 89731, am a member of the College.  
(3)	I, Dr. Qureshi, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-40331-W5M8C3 (the "Investigation") into my care of an in-patient in my internal medicine practice.
B.	UNDERTAKING
(4)	I, Dr. Qureshi, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
(5)	Professional Education  
(a)	I, Dr. Qureshi, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):
(i)	Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following resources:            
1.	Aberer F, Hochfellner DA, Sourij H, Mader JK. A Practical Guide for the Management of Steroid Induced Hyperglycaemia in the Hospital. Journal of Clinical Medicine. 2021; 10(10):2154; 
2.	UpToDate, Management of diabetes mellitus in hospitalized patients, November 2022; 
3.	Bolli G, Perriello G, Fanelli CG, De Feo P. Nocturnal Blood Glucose Control in Type I Diabetes Mellitus. Diabetes Care. 1983; 16(3), 71-89.
(b)	I, Dr. Qureshi, acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.
(c)	I, Dr. Qureshi, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.
(d)	I, Dr. Qureshi, acknowledge that if any of the resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.
(6)	In-patient log
(a)	I, Dr. Qureshi, undertake that following completion of the Professional Education in section (5) above, I will maintain a log of all diabetic in-patients for whom I am the most responsible physician ("MRP"), which will include at least the following information ("the Diabetic In-Patient Log"), and which shall be submitted to the College on a monthly basis until the completion of the reassessment of my practice under section (7) of this Undertaking:
(i)	The name of the patient and chart/file number; and
(ii)	The date of each encounter with the patient.
(7)	Reassessment of Practice
(a)	I, Dr. Qureshi, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (5) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment will include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) of my diabetic in-patient charts, and may include interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
(b)	I, Dr. Qureshi, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
(c)	I, Dr. Qureshi, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
(8)	Monitoring 
(a)	I, Dr. Qureshi, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
(b)	I, Dr. Qureshi, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
(c)	I, Dr. Qureshi, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "B". 
C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(9)	I, Dr. Qureshi, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(10)	I, Dr. Qureshi, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 
(11)	I, Dr. Qureshi, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(12)	I, Dr. Qureshi, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").
(13)	I, Dr. Qureshi, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.
(14)	I, Dr. Qureshi, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 
(15)	Public Register
(a)	I, Dr. Qureshi, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b)	I, Dr. Qureshi, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Qureshi's care of an in-patient in his internal medicine practice.  As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Qureshi will engage in professional education in the management of diabetes in hospitalized patients.
Dr. Qureshi's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the completion of the professional education.
(c)	I, Dr. Qureshi, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
D.	CONSENT
(16)	I, Dr. Qureshi, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and/or to all Assessors:
(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 
(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(17)	I, Dr. Qureshi, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(18)	I, Dr. Qureshi, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;
(b)	any information relevant to the Reassessment;
(c)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;  and/or
(d)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.



Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 3, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Shahzad Qureshi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 3, 2023:
 
Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Qureshi’s care of an in-patient in his internal medicine practice.  As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Qureshi will engage in professional education in the management of diabetes in hospitalized patients.

Dr. Qureshi’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the completion of the professional education.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 12, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)