skip to content

Lo, Sze Wut

CPSO#: 88826

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of General Surgery
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J6
Phone: (905) 494-6595 Ext. 56595
Fax: (905) 494-6620 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S.W. Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lo ( CPSO# 88826 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of General Surgery
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3L6
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SZE WUT LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014