skip to content

Comstock, Shawna Marie Cassandra

CPSO#: 98155

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Little Lake Health Centre
11 Lakeside Terrace, Suite 201
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: 705-881-9810 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. C. Cochrane and S. Comstock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cochrane ( CPSO# 97751 )
Dr. S. Comstock ( CPSO# 98155 )

Business Address:
Little Lake Health Centre
201 - 11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 881-9810

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAWNA MARIE CASSANDRA COMSTOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMSTOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2015