skip to content

Abdur-Rehman, Saleha

CPSO#: 96007

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Skyward Family Practice
104-2255 Dundas st W
Mississauga ON  L5K 1R6
Phone: 905-608-2111
Fax: 905-608-2999 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sandalwood Medical Center
Unit 1 170 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton ON  L6Z 1Y5
Canada
Phone: (905) 846-8282
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Abdur-Rehman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abdur-Rehman ( CPSO# 96007 )

Business Address:
1-170 Sandlewood Parkway
Brampton ON  L6Z 1Y5
Phone Number: (905) 846-8282

Business Address:
104 - 2555 Erin Center Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5K 1R6
Phone Number: (905) 608-2111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SALEHA ABDUR-REHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDUR-REHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013