skip to content

Ruzhynsky, Vladimir

CPSO#: 95872

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Mar 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vladimir Ruzhynsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2019
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Sep 2020