THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:52:21 AM
Ruzhynsky, Vladimir
CPSO#:
95872
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
04 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Mar 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Vladimir Ruzhynsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2019 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2020 |