skip to content

Rudkowski, Jill Carole

CPSO#: 86067

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Dept of General Internal Medicine
Suite F507
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 37658
Fax: (905) 521-6068 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Goffin Rudkowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Goffin ( CPSO# 69872 )
Dr. J. Rudkowski ( CPSO# 86067 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Suite 3-15
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
Dept of General Internal Medicine
Suite F507
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:25 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JILL CAROLE RUDKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Apr 2007 to 01 Jul 2007
CF - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007