THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 15:45:19 PM
Rudkowski, Jill Carole
CPSO#:
86067
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Calgary, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 9055221155
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:25 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JILL CAROLE RUDKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDKOWSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2007 to 01 Jul 2007
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Apr 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2007 |