skip to content

Rozenblyum, Evelyn Victoria

CPSO#: 90635

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-6060 Ext. 6560
Fax: 416-864-6073 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Rheumatology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-8137500
Fax: 4168134989
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 75382
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Evelyn V. Rozenblyum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:27 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EVELYN VICTORIA ROZENBLYUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROZENBLYUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2013