THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 5:36:54 AM
Rozenblyum, Evelyn Victoria
CPSO#:
90635
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Russian
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-6060 Ext. 6560
Fax: 416-864-6073
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care |
Hamilton |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:27 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EVELYN VICTORIA ROZENBLYUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROZENBLYUM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2013 |