skip to content

Roy-Boulos, Anne-Marie

CPSO#: 29796

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Apr 1986

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Roy, Anne-Marie (used until: 03 Jul 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seen in Ottawa: UOHS,100 Marie Curie, Ottawa ON K1N 6N5 Tel: (613) 564-3950 Fax: (613) 564-6627 Patients seen on Kent St: Docudavit Solutions, 28 Eugene St, Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 10 Mar 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Mar 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015