THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:35:34 AM
Roy-Boulos, Anne-Marie
CPSO#:
29796
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Apr 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Roy, Anne-Marie (used until: 03 Jul 1990 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seen in Ottawa: UOHS,100 Marie Curie, Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Tel: (613) 564-3950 Fax: (613) 564-6627
Patients seen on Kent St: Docudavit Solutions, 28 Eugene St, Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 10 Mar 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:24 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Mar 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |