skip to content

Rolbin, Stephen Harvey

CPSO#: 24773

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Apr 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jul 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 6-May-2015

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rolbin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 30 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 202 18 Lower Village Gate Toronto ON M5P 3M1
Date Received: 08 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:11 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Apr 2015