THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:31:32 PM
Rolbin, Stephen Harvey
CPSO#:
24773
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Jul 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
6-May-2015
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rolbin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 30 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Suite 202
18 Lower Village Gate
Toronto ON M5P 3M1
Date Received: 08 Apr 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:11 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Apr 2015 |