skip to content

Rogalla, Patrik

CPSO#: 91819

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Free University of Berlin, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
Room 920 PMH, 3rd Floor
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 2759
Fax: (416) 340-3900 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Germany

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Feb 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2014 Active
 1.    Dr. Patrik Rogalla may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Medical  Imaging, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Rogalla  holds  a  geographical   full-time  teaching  or  research
                        appointment at the rank of Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required by the teaching  or research requirements of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate will automatically expire when  Dr.  Rogalla  no  longer
                  holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.