THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:44:14 PM
Rogalla, Patrik
CPSO#:
91819
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Free University of Berlin, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
Room 920 PMH, 3rd Floor
610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 2759
Fax: (416) 340-3900
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Germany
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 11 Feb 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Feb 2014 |
|
Active |