skip to content

Kilian, Rochagne

CPSO#: 110334

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 27 Oct 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Oct 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of the Orange Free State, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R. Kilian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kilian ( CPSO# 110334)

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:21 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 15 Oct 2021