THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:02:58 PM
Kilian, Rochagne
CPSO#:
110334
MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of
27 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Oct 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of the Orange Free State, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:21 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2021 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 15 Oct 2021 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 27 Oct 2021 |
Pending Hearings
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Rochagné Kilian’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Tribunal of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Kilian engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or failed to respond appropriately or within a reasonable period of time to a written inquiry from the College, by, commencing in approximately October 2021, failing to co-operate with the College’s investigation, including by failing to provide information, records and documents requested by College staff.
Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)